TN SB2560 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 845
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers primary administrative responsibilities for the Tennessee Adventure Tourism and Development Act of 2011 from the department of economic and community development to the department of tourist development. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, transfers primary administrative responsibilities for the Tennessee Adventure Tourism and Development Act of 2011 from the department of economic and community development to the department of tourist development. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 845 | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1556 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 845