TN SB2553 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, urges department of health to conduct a study of the effectiveness of medical assisted treatment programs, including whether they should be required to be provided onsite or through referral in intensive outpatient, partial hospitalization, and residential levels of care; requires the department to report its findings and recommendations, on or before February 15, 2021, to the health and welfare committee of the senate and health committee of the house of representatives if such study is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, urges department of health to conduct a study of the effectiveness of medical assisted treatment programs, including whether they should be required to be provided onsite or through referral in intensive outpatient, partial hospitalization, and residential levels of care; requires the department to report its findings and recommendations, on or before February 15, 2021, to the health and welfare committee of the senate and health committee of the house of representatives if such study is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2624 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.