TN SB2547 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department of finance and administration to manage online payments to state government; authorizes the charging of additional fees to cover the cost of accepting online payments; clarifies that an online payment through the state portal does not discharge an obligation to the state until the state receives actual final payment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department of finance and administration to manage online payments to state government; authorizes the charging of additional fees to cover the cost of accepting online payments; clarifies that an online payment through the state portal does not discharge an obligation to the state until the state receives actual final payment. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 880 | |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1544 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 880