TN SB2536 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "K-12 Block Grant Act," which distributes block grants to each LEA to improve the quality of education; appropriates $250 million from excess state tax revenues over-collected in fiscal years 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 for K-12 block grants. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9 and Title 49, relative to kindergarten through grade twelve (K-12) education funding. This act makes appropriations for kindergarten through grade twelve education funding for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2844 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration