TN SB2508 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the achievement school district (ASD) to develop standards for parental involvement for schools in the ASD and to include in the state report each school's compliance with the standards beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, requires the achievement school district (ASD) to develop standards for parental involvement for schools in the ASD and to include in the state report each school's compliance with the standards beginning with the 2015-2016 school year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2370 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-25 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2508&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2508.pdf |