TN SB2501 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 938
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires, rather than recommends, that the course of instruction for students in grades five through eight include curricula designed to educate students in black history and black culture. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-1006.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 49-6-1006, relative to black history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 938 | |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2106 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2025