TN SB2500 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a court to order the arresting law enforcement agency to pay reasonable attorney's fees to a defendant whose charges are dismissed due to mistaken identity if the law enforcement agency did not exercise due diligence in investigating the alleged offense. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, requires a court to order the arresting law enforcement agency to pay reasonable attorney's fees to a defendant whose charges are dismissed due to mistaken identity if the law enforcement agency did not exercise due diligence in investigating the alleged offense. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2373 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary