TN SB2487 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain state and county officials to consult with the speaker of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives prior to entering into consent decrees to change state election laws or rules; gives the general assembly legal standing to file an action against such state officials for violating election laws. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 1, relative to election laws.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 947 | |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Comittee to 03/29/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2483 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022