TN SB2484 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the deadline by which a distressed rural county must apply to be eligible to retain the sales and use tax generated from a commercial development district from December 31, 2020, to December 31, 2024. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1006 | |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2614 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/07/2022