TN SB2478 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 10/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that judges of the supreme court, court of appeals, chancery courts, circuit courts, criminal courts, and courts exercising the jurisdiction imposed in one or more of the chancery courts, circuit courts or criminal courts be in good standing with the board of responsibility not have been publicly censured by the board of professional responsibility or suspended or disbarred from the practice of law within the 10 years preceding the judge's term of office for engaging in conduct involving dishonesty, fraud, deceit, or misrepresentation. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 37, relative to the judiciary.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 5 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CURCIO PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY CURCIO PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 10/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1120 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 2 (Amendment 5 - HA0948) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0848) |
2022-04-25 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 5 - HA0948) |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA0908) |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0872) |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0871) |
2022-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 3, PNV 3 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0909) |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2538 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1120