TN SB2475 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provisions authorizing permitless carry of handguns; requires range training for handgun carry permits. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2648 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Failed for lack of second in: Civil Justice Subcommittee