TN SB2462 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the department to promulgate rules to establish a grant program for first-time home buyers. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 47 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10; Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 47 and Title 66, relative to first-time home buyers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Failed for lack of second in: Property & Planning Subcommittee