TN SB2457 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to promulgate rules to effectuate the purposes of the provisions governing pharmacy benefits managers and pharmacy benefits. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 56, relative to the department of commerce and insurance's ability to promulgate rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 998 | |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/6/2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2660 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022