TN SB2426 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, declares settlement agreement provisions that have purpose or effect of concealing details relating to claim of child sexual abuse, except for identifying information concerning victim, as void and unenforceable and contrary to public policy of state. - Amends TCA Title 20 and Title 29, Chapter 34, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, declares settlement agreement provisions that have purpose or effect of concealing details relating to claim of child sexual abuse, except for identifying information concerning victim, as void and unenforceable and contrary to public policy of state. - Amends TCA Title 20 and Title 29, Chapter 34, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2523 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 962