TN SB2397 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes state procurement agencies to enter into an energy performance or guaranteed energy savings contract using alternative procurement or contracting vehicles for purposes of developing and implementing up to five energy performance or guaranteed energy savings contract pilot projects for state-owned buildings and facilities. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, authorizes state procurement agencies to enter into an energy performance or guaranteed energy savings contract using alternative procurement or contracting vehicles for purposes of developing and implementing up to five energy performance or guaranteed energy savings contract pilot projects for state-owned buildings and facilities. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902 | |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2432 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 902