TN SB2370 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 963
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 963
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, directs the commissioner to develop a plan for Tennessee to assist in rehabilitating victims of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, directs the commissioner to develop a plan for Tennessee to assist in rehabilitating victims of human trafficking. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 963 | |
2012-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/12 | |
2012-05-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-05-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-30 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2012-04-27 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2012-04-27 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | S. Reset on message cal. for 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2012-04-24 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1188) | |
2012-04-24 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-03-15 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2012-03-12 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2012-03-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/12/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-28 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-21 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 2/28/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/21/2012 | |
2012-02-14 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 2/21/12 | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2492 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 963