TN SB2352 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $10,000 to $25,000 the threshold amount for certain purchases by or for a county road department or by a chief administrative officer that may be made by means other than public advertisement and competitive bid. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 14; Title 5, Chapter 21; Title 12, Chapter 3 and Title 54, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5, Chapter 14; Title 5, Chapter 21; Title 12, Chapter 3 and Title 54, Chapter 7, relative to county purchasing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2022 | |
2022-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 1036 | |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-25 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0740) |
2022-04-25 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0632) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2519 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1036