TN SB2351 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits certain institutions of higher education from defining discriminatory practices in their antidiscrimination policies in a manner inconsistent with the definition of discriminatory practices in state law; prohibits certain institutions of higher education from establishing or recognizing forms of discrimination in their antidiscrimination policies in a manner inconsistent with the forms of discrimination recognized as legally actionable by this state; requires the Tennessee higher education commission to establish a process for persons to file a complaint alleging that an institution is not complying with such prohibitions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to the antidiscrimination practices of institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1660 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-11 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration