TN SB2351 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows personal vehicle operated by a transportation network company driver to display one or more removable, illuminated, interior trade dress devices in any color other than red or blue, or in any combination of colors other than red or blue, that is issued by a transportation network company and that assists passengers in identifying and communicating with transportation network company drivers. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, allows personal vehicle operated by a transportation network company driver to display one or more removable, illuminated, interior trade dress devices in any color other than red or blue, or in any combination of colors other than red or blue, that is issued by a transportation network company and that assists passengers in identifying and communicating with transportation network company drivers. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8 and Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 645 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 3/15/18 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2642 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 645