TN SB2342 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 796
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits the establishment of rules, policies or guidelines that require classroom or position observation results to be aligned with TVAAS data. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, prohibits the establishment of rules, policies or guidelines that require classroom or position observation results to be aligned with TVAAS data. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- ref to S. Cal. Com. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 796 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 769 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0899) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. Ed. Comm. 3/24/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2264 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 796