TN SB2333 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits any official or employee of this state or any political subdivision of this state from accepting an identification document issued or created by any person, organization, county, city, or other local authority, except where expressly authorized to be used for identification purposes by the general assembly to determine a person's identity or residency unless required by federal law; prohibits any local government or law enforcement agency from authorizing the use of any such card or document as a form of identification to be used to determine the identity or residency of any person. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 55.
Title
As enacted, prohibits any official or employee of this state or any political subdivision of this state from accepting an identification document issued or created by any person, organization, county, city, or other local authority, except where expressly authorized to be used for identification purposes by the general assembly to determine a person's identity or residency unless required by federal law; prohibits any local government or law enforcement agency from authorizing the use of any such card or document as a form of identification to be used to determine the identity or residency of any person. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1053 | |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 1 PNV 2 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1053