TN SB2329 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a teacher from being disciplined or having remedial actions taken against the teacher if the teacher is teaching to Tennessee academic standards or using state- or LEA-approved instructional materials as part of a course of instruction, curriculum, or instructional program. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to teacher discipline.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2408 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration