TN SB2311 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds immediate family members as persons that a victim of a crime may have present during a defense interview with the victim. - Amends TCA Section 40-38-115.
Title
As introduced, adds immediate family members as persons that a victim of a crime may have present during a defense interview with the victim. - Amends TCA Section 40-38-115.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2389 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee