TN SB2295 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state on or after January 1, 2017. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state on or after January 1, 2017. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-28 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 942 | |
2018-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/15/2018 | |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-19 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1195) |
2018-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-18 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0946) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/17/18 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/16/18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2328 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 942