TN HB2328 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state on or after January 1, 2017. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state on or after January 1, 2017. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 942 | |
2018-04-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2295 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 942