TN SB2292 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the authority of wildlife resources officers to conduct certain searches does not permit search or inspection of the interior of an automobile without a search warrant. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the authority of wildlife resources officers to conduct certain searches does not permit search or inspection of the interior of an automobile without a search warrant. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 799 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 4, PNV 2 |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0929) |
2020-06-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0554) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2492 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799