TN HB2492 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the authority of wildlife resources officers to conduct certain searches does not permit search or inspection of the interior of an automobile without a search warrant. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the authority of wildlife resources officers to conduct certain searches does not permit search or inspection of the interior of an automobile without a search warrant. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 70.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 799 | |
2020-06-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2292 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 799