TN SB2290 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that any real property tax rate increase be passed at a minimum of two consecutive, regularly scheduled meetings; requires a two-thirds vote for property tax increases of 5 percent or greater; authorizes referendum on the question of a property tax rate increase of 5 percent or greater if the tax increase is not approved by a two-thirds vote of the local legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires that any real property tax rate increase be passed at a minimum of two consecutive, regularly scheduled meetings; requires a two-thirds vote for property tax increases of 5 percent or greater; authorizes referendum on the question of a property tax rate increase of 5 percent or greater if the tax increase is not approved by a two-thirds vote of the local legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2695 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 815
HB2395 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
HB2395 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee