TN SB2287 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2019; schedules rules filed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities regarding public records and the board for professional counselors, marital and family therapists, and clinical pastoral therapists regarding continuing education and professional ethics to expire on the effective date of the act. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2019; schedules rules filed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities regarding public records and the board for professional counselors, marital and family therapists, and clinical pastoral therapists regarding continuing education and professional ethics to expire on the effective date of the act. - Title 4, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 653 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Govt Ops Comm. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2378 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 653