TN HB2378 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2019; schedules rules filed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities regarding public records and the board for professional counselors, marital and family therapists, and clinical pastoral therapists regarding continuing education and professional ethics to expire on the effective date of the act. - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, continues permanent rules filed with the secretary of state after January 1, 2019; schedules rules filed by the department of intellectual and developmental disabilities regarding public records and the board for professional counselors, marital and family therapists, and clinical pastoral therapists regarding continuing education and professional ethics to expire on the effective date of the act. - Title 4, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2020-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-19HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2020-03-19HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0660)
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0679)
2020-03-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2020-02-05HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB2287 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback