TN SB2261 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 973
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 973
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises qualifications for employee and server permits issued by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, revises qualifications for employee and server permits issued by the commission. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 973 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-19 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-15 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #1 |
2014-04-14 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 8, PNV 6 |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1009) |
2014-04-14 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2137 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 973