TN SB2255 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 790
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain off-highway vehicles that have top speeds over 35 mph and nonstraddle seating for up to four passengers, to be operated on county roads; authorizes issuance of off-highway license plates for each category; establishes equipment and safety requirements for the vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, authorizes certain off-highway vehicles that have top speeds over 35 mph and nonstraddle seating for up to four passengers, to be operated on county roads; authorizes issuance of off-highway license plates for each category; establishes equipment and safety requirements for the vehicles. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 790 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2016; 01/01/2017 | |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-03-28 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0659) |
2016-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0651) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2288 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 790