TN SB2248 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, conditions courts' authority to order acquisition and maintenance of health insurance coverage under a child support award upon the availability of reasonable and affordable health insurance. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-101.
Title
As enacted, conditions courts' authority to order acquisition and maintenance of health insurance coverage under a child support award upon the availability of reasonable and affordable health insurance. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-101.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 742 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1823 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742