TN SB2248 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends immunity to person who causes injury or death to another or damage to property in performing services requested by government during an emergency, including training exercises, unless damage results from gross negligence or willful misconduct; limits immunity for persons who provide emergency shelters under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 58-2-121.
Title
As introduced, extends immunity to person who causes injury or death to another or damage to property in performing services requested by government during an emergency, including training exercises, unless damage results from gross negligence or willful misconduct; limits immunity for persons who provide emergency shelters under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 58-2-121.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to 4/29/09 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2299 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-27 - Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2248&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2248.pdf |