TN SB2227 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the clerk of court to waive an in-person oath by a fiduciary if the fiduciary files with the clerk a written fiduciary oath that contains certain language and is sworn or affirmed by the fiduciary in the presence of a notary public or signed and dated under penalty of perjury; specifies certain language that a fiduciary oath must contain under various circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 34, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 34, Chapter 1, relative to fiduciary oaths.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Bill Powers [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 582 | |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1993 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024