TN SB2225 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a substance abuse peer assistance or treatment program to report to a practitioner's licensing board by electronic means the failure of the practitioner participating in the program to maintain compliance with the program's terms and conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, permits a substance abuse peer assistance or treatment program to report to a practitioner's licensing board by electronic means the failure of the practitioner participating in the program to maintain compliance with the program's terms and conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee