TN HB2185 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a substance abuse peer assistance or treatment program to report to a practitioner's licensing board by electronic means the failure of the practitioner participating in the program to maintain compliance with the program's terms and conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, permits a substance abuse peer assistance or treatment program to report to a practitioner's licensing board by electronic means the failure of the practitioner participating in the program to maintain compliance with the program's terms and conditions. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2225 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee