TN SB2202 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local board of education and public charter school governing body to adopt a code of conduct for visitors for each school under the authority of the board or governing body that describes the types of acceptable behavior from visitors on school grounds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to codes of conduct at schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2381 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-11 - Comp. SB subst.