TN HB2381 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each local board of education and public charter school governing body to adopt a code of conduct for visitors for each school under the authority of the board or governing body that describes the types of acceptable behavior from visitors on school grounds. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to codes of conduct at schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 810 | |
2024-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c K-12 Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2202 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2024