TN SB2200 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education, in coordination with the department of mental health and substance abuse services, to submit a report to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives regarding state-funded mental and behavioral health services available to elementary and secondary school students on or before December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 16; Title 33 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education, in coordination with the department of mental health and substance abuse services, to submit a report to the education committees of the senate and house of representatives regarding state-funded mental and behavioral health services available to elementary and secondary school students on or before December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 16; Title 33 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2267 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee