TN SB2197 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a manufacturer of alcoholic beverages to enter into an alternating proprietorship agreement with one or more manufacturers for the purpose of alternating the use of a bonded or general premises between the manufacturers for the purpose of manufacturing alcoholic beverages, including high alcohol content beer. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, relative to manufacturers of alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 689 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/28/2022