TN SB2193 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, attributes the data from TCAPs and end of course exams of a student transferring from one LEA to another or from one school to another to the school at which the student was in attendance for the greatest number of days. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Title
As introduced, attributes the data from TCAPs and end of course exams of a student transferring from one LEA to another or from one school to another to the school at which the student was in attendance for the greatest number of days. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2052 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee