TN SB2187 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers responsibility for administration of the Tennessee sports hall of fame from the commissioner of tourist development to the hall's board of directors and makes other changes concerning the sports hall of fame. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 54.
Title
As enacted, transfers responsibility for administration of the Tennessee sports hall of fame from the commissioner of tourist development to the hall's board of directors and makes other changes concerning the sports hall of fame. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 54.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 699 | |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/4/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2254 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 699