TN SB2182 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires marketplace facilitators to remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires marketplace facilitators to remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06 Pub. Ch. 646
2020-04-06 Effective date(s) 10/01/2020
2020-04-01SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-03-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-03-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-03-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-03-19HousePassed H., Ayes 86, Nays 1, PNV 4
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0685)
2020-03-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-19HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0, PNV 1
2020-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0653)
2020-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2020
2020-03-17SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-03-16SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3/17/20
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/17/2020
2020-03-10SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/17/2020
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
2020-02-25SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
2020-02-25SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation
2020-02-18SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-11SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2020-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2249 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 646

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback