TN HB2249 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 646
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires marketplace facilitators to remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires marketplace facilitators to remit sales tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 646 | |
2020-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2182 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 646