TN SB2182 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes retail food stores to sell wine on Sundays and remits the retail gallonage tax from Sunday sales to the newly created low income children pre-kindergarten scholarship fund; requires the department of education to use money in the fund to establish a scholarship program to provide access to pre-kindergarten to children from low income families. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes retail food stores to sell wine on Sundays and remits the retail gallonage tax from Sunday sales to the newly created low income children pre-kindergarten scholarship fund; requires the department of education to use money in the fund to establish a scholarship program to provide access to pre-kindergarten to children from low income families. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 57, Chapter 3; Title 57, Chapter 4 and Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2517 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2182&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/SB2182.pdf |