TN SB2182 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1027
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1027
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a person may be prosecuted, tried and punished for producing obscene material, sexual exploitation of a minor, aggravated sexual exploitation of a minor or especially aggravated sexual exploitation of a minor, no later than 25 years from the date the child becomes 18 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, provides that a person may be prosecuted, tried and punished for producing obscene material, sexual exploitation of a minor, aggravated sexual exploitation of a minor or especially aggravated sexual exploitation of a minor, no later than 25 years from the date the child becomes 18 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1027 | |
2012-04-25 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1157) | |
2012-04-25 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-24 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2012-04-09 | Recalled from S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2012-04-04 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2278 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 1027