TN SB2150 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to collaborate with the bureau of TennCare in order to study existing doula certification programs; requires that a report on the study be provided to the members of the general assembly and to the legislative librarian by December 31, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71, relative to doulas.
Sponsors
Sen. London Lamar [D] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] |
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Bailey (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 1 by Bailey (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1108 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 13, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0755) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-31 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0677) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2109 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1108