TN SB2148 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires financial institutions and insurers to make determinations about the provision or denial of services based on certain analysis; prohibits financial institutions and insurers from denying or canceling services to a person, or otherwise discriminating against a person, based upon certain factors, including the person's political opinions, speech, or affiliations, or religious beliefs, religious exercise, or religious affiliations. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 56, relative to consumer protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 746 | |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2100 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024