TN SB2144 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the legislative body of a municipality to designate a committee of the legislative body as the planning commission. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 13, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 13, Chapter 4, relative to municipal planning.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2364 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee